HI SR52 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR52
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Analysis On Licensing And/or Certification Of Community Health Workers.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Analysis On Licensing And/or Certification Of Community Health Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-25-21. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1117) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-18-21 3:20PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR52 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR70 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SCR70 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.