HI SR51 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR51
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Manoa College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources, Department Of Agriculture, And Department Of Education To Create A Strategy For Students To Learn About Modern Farming.
Title
Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Manoa College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources, Department Of Agriculture, And Department Of Education To Create A Strategy For Students To Learn About Modern Farming.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from AEN/EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EDU/HRE. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR51 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Subjects
Agriculture
Department of Agriculture
Department of Education
Modern Farming
Students
University of Hawaii
Department of Agriculture
Department of Education
Modern Farming
Students
University of Hawaii