HI SR45 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Provide An Itemized Accounting Of The $1,000,000 That The Justice Reinvestment Initiative Set Aside In 2012 For Community-based Programs And The $3,400,000 Set Aside In 2013 For Expanding Treatment Programs And Victims' Services And Initiating Plans To Establish A Research And Planning Office.
Title
Justice Reinvestment Initiative; Accounting
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, L. Thielen. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=45&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SR45_.HTM |