HI SR43 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR43
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Papa Ola Lokahi To Assess The Impact On Social, Financial, And Cultural Integrity Of Providing Health Coverage For Certain Native Hawaiian Culture-based Activities.
Title
Requesting Papa Ola Lokahi To Assess The Impact On Social, Financial, And Cultural Integrity Of Providing Health Coverage For Certain Native Hawaiian Culture-based Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3398) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-22-18 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HWN/CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR43 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Referred to CPH/AEN.
HR55 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR55 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39