HI SR30 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR30
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring A Climate Emergency And Requesting Statewide Collaboration Toward An Immediate Just Transition And Emergency Mobilization Effort To Restore A Safe Climate.
Title
Declaring A Climate Emergency And Requesting Statewide Collaboration Toward An Immediate Just Transition And Emergency Mobilization Effort To Restore A Safe Climate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1) with Senators Baker, Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere, San Buenaventura, and Wakai voting "Aye, with reservations". |
2021-03-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-23-21. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR30 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR55 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
SCR44 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR55 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
SCR44 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.