HI SR30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR30
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Performance Audit Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Performance Audit Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO/WTL, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR30 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WTL/CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=30&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SR30_.HTM |