HI SR30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR30
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Agribusiness Development Corporation To Start A Farm Apprenticeship Program.
Title
Urging The Agribusiness Development Corporation To Start A Farm Apprenticeship Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-18. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3714) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3224), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 1:50PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR30 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=30&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR30_.HTM |