HI SR214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR214
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That June 27 Of Each Year Be Recognized As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day And Designating The Month Of June Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting That June 27 Of Each Year Be Recognized As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day And Designating The Month Of June Of Each Year As Post-traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1392) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR214 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR255 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 32
SCR255 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 32