HI SR20 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR20
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Enact Legislation To Address The Rise In Illegal Text Messages.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Enact Legislation To Address The Rise In Illegal Text Messages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3682) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-30-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR20 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
HR49 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SCR26 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR49 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SCR26 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.