HI SR172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR172
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation And The Governor To Collaborate With The Legislature To Ensure Expedited Burials For Veterans, Deceased Active Duty Members Of The United States Armed Forces, And Their Spouses At Veterans Cemeteries Throughout The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation And The Governor To Collaborate With The Legislature To Ensure Expedited Burials For Veterans, Deceased Active Duty Members Of The United States Armed Forces, And Their Spouses At Veterans Cemeteries Throughout The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1687) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR172 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR43 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR43 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=172&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR172_.HTM |