HI SR159 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Native Hawaiian Convention To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations And Strategies To Create Hawaiian Nationality As A Protected Class For Purposes Of Hawaii's Anti-discrimination Laws.
Title
Urging The Native Hawaiian Convention To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations And Strategies To Create Hawaiian Nationality As A Protected Class For Purposes Of Hawaii's Anti-discrimination Laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | The recommendation was not adopted. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 1 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 4 No(es): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 06-30-20 12:31PM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 12:32PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR159 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.