HI SR147 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety And The Hawaii Paroling Authority To Create A Three-year Pilot Program For Medical Or Compassionate Release Of Certain Ill, Disabled, And Geriatric Inmates Who Pose A Low Risk To Public Safety.
Title
Parole; Compassionate Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1313) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/HTH/HMS. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 04-01-13 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH/HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=147&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR147_.HTM |