HI SR140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR140
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Establish A Task Force To Conduct A Study Concerning The Current And Future Needs Of The State Archives.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Establish A Task Force To Conduct A Study Concerning The Current And Future Needs Of The State Archives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1704) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LCA. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR140 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
HR162 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HR162 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).