HI SR134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Study The Adequacy Of Insurance Coverage Requirements For Transportation Network Companies And Transportation Network Company Drivers.
Title
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Study The Adequacy Of Insurance Coverage Requirements For Transportation Network Companies And Transportation Network Company Drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3444) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPH/TRE. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Coverage Requirements
Study
Transportation Network Companies
Transportation Network Company Drivers
Insurance Coverage Requirements
Study
Transportation Network Companies
Transportation Network Company Drivers