HI SR131 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Explore The Retention Of A New Program Manager For Its Eb-5 Immigrant Investor License Or Sell Or Transfer Its Eb-5 Immigrant Investor License.
Title
EB-5 Immigrant Investor Regional Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1102), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=131&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR131_.HTM |