HI SR129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations To Expand Blue Carbon Initiatives In The State.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development To Convene A Working Group To Develop Recommendations To Expand Blue Carbon Initiatives In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3501) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 1:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR26 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17
SCR151 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
SCR151 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27