HI SR125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii System To Utilize And Expand Existing Undergraduate General Education Core Requirement Curriculum And Programs Across The Various Campuses Rather Than Allow Each Campus To Create Its Own Curriculum And Programs.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii System To Utilize And Expand Existing Undergraduate General Education Core Requirement Curriculum And Programs Across The Various Campuses Rather Than Allow Each Campus To Create Its Own Curriculum And Programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-18. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3709) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3304), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |