HI SR105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR105
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Creative Resurgence Task Force Continue To Examine And Determine Measures And Establish Policies And Programs To Build And Foster Creativity And Innovation Through The Arts, Culture, And Humanities In The State.
Title
Requesting That The Creative Resurgence Task Force Continue To Examine And Determine Measures And Establish Policies And Programs To Build And Foster Creativity And Innovation Through The Arts, Culture, And Humanities In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3820) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR105 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to GVO/AEN.
HR161 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
SCR118 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR161 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
SCR118 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.