HI SR10 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR10
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And Kauai Department Of Public Works To Conduct A Study To Identify And Recommend Methods To Alleviate Traffic Congestion At Certain Intersections Along The Kaumualii Highway.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And Kauai Department Of Public Works To Conduct A Study To Identify And Recommend Methods To Alleviate Traffic Congestion At Certain Intersections Along The Kaumualii Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1406) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR10 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR30 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR21 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 32
HR30 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR21 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 32