HI SR10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR10
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirming The Use Of The Term "deaf-blind" By The State Of Hawaii And The Counties.
Title
Reaffirming The Use Of The Term "deaf-blind" By The State Of Hawaii And The Counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-19. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR10 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).