HI SCR99 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR99
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Okimoto.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Okimoto.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene An Interdepartmental Working Group To Address The Lack Of Consolidated, Consistent Health Screening Programs In Public Schools For Children In The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene An Interdepartmental Working Group To Address The Lack Of Consolidated, Consistent Health Screening Programs In Public Schools For Children In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Okimoto. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 11:30AM. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/LHE on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 611) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS/EDU. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS/EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR99 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Okimoto.
HCR114 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR114 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33