HI SCR97 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Establish A Hawaii Public Schools Financial Literacy Task Force.
Title
Financial Literacy; Public Schools; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 673). |
2015-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-05-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1690), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka, Ward. |
2015-04-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-27-15 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 418) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1319) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |