HI SCR94 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR94
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Energy Office To Engage The United States Department Of Energy To Establish A Permanent Presence Within The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Energy Office To Engage The United States Department Of Energy To Establish A Permanent Presence Within The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2053-22), recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 678) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from EET/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3769) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR94 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Re-Referred to AEN.
HCR46 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to EET/PSM.
SR84 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR46 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Referred to EET/PSM.
SR84 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.