HI SCR92 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And The Public Land Development Corporation, With The Assistance Of The County Of Hawaii, To Conduct A Study On The Establishment Of A Public-private Partnership To Develop And Improve The East Hawaii Area Of Hawaii County.
Title
Banyan Drive; Land and Natural Resources; Study; Public-Private Partnership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 714). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WLH/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3456) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Offered. |