HI SCR90 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR90
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Marine Corps Base Hawaii To Upgrade The Capacity Of Its Sewage Treatment Plant And Redundancy Of The Components To Ensure That Final Effluent Quality Is In Compliance With State Permitting Requirements.
Title
Urging Marine Corps Base Hawaii To Upgrade The Capacity Of Its Sewage Treatment Plant And Redundancy Of The Components To Ensure That Final Effluent Quality Is In Compliance With State Permitting Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 911). |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of reconsideration and Senate agreement (Sen. Com. No. 911). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-25-22. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-25-22. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 881). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 725). |
2022-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-19 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2120-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3791) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-22 1:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR90 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
HCR70 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Referred to AEN/PSM.
SR80 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR70 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Referred to AEN/PSM.
SR80 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.