HI SCR89 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR89
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Work With The Capitol Management Group, In Consultation With Historic Preservation Offices, To Identify On-site Energy Production And Energy Conservation Opportunities And Transition The State Capitol Building Into An Energy Efficient Building.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Work With The Capitol Management Group, In Consultation With Historic Preservation Offices, To Identify On-site Energy Production And Energy Conservation Opportunities And Transition The State Capitol Building Into An Energy Efficient Building.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2226), recommending referral to LMG. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Yamane. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:40AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EEP, LMG, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 609) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1851) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from GVO/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1638), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EET added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-25-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR89 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).