HI SCR88 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR88
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting And Adopting The Goals Set Forth In The Digital Equity Declaration For Hawaii Adopted By The Broadband Hui.
Title
Supporting And Adopting The Goals Set Forth In The Digital Equity Declaration For Hawaii Adopted By The Broadband Hui.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1757) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 04-07-21 11:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 515). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1387) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR88 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR161 (Same As) 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR67 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR161 (Same As) 2021-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR67 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.