HI SCR84 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Report On Strategies And Resources To Reduce Recidivism Among Native Hawaiians.
Title
Task Force; OHA; Report to Address Recidivism in Native Hawaiians
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Thursday, 04-21-11 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, referral sheet 62 | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1301) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-11 1:20PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to PGM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to PGM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ryan, Hee, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, English, Kahele. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 04-01-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Referred to HWN, PGM. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Offered. |