HI SCR83 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR83
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess Both The Social And Financial Effects Of Proposed Mandated Health Insurance Coverage That Requires Insurers, Hospital And Medical Services Plans, And Health Maintenance Organizations To Provide Coverage For Medical Procedures To Eliminate Or Provide Maximum Feasible Treatment Of Port-wine Stains.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Assess Both The Social And Financial Effects Of Proposed Mandated Health Insurance Coverage That Requires Insurers, Hospital And Medical Services Plans, And Health Maintenance Organizations To Provide Coverage For Medical Procedures To Eliminate Or Provide Maximum Feasible Treatment Of Port-wine Stains.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-24-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 829). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 641). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2077-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2018-04-20 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 04-20-18 9:00AM in House conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | House | Re-referred to HHS, referral sheet 62 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 519) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3491) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3311), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/LBR added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to CPH/LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR83 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on CPH/GVO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 229.