HI SCR81 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR81
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting All Public Elementary, Intermediate, And Middle Schools In The State To Participate In The Safe Routes To School Program Established Pursuant To Section 291c-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Keiki Health Benefits.
Title
Requesting All Public Elementary, Intermediate, And Middle Schools In The State To Participate In The Safe Routes To School Program Established Pursuant To Section 291c-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Keiki Health Benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from LHE/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Quinlan; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Tokioka. |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 11:31AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on LHE/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 11:31am. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE/HLT on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:01PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1824) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1626), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR81 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=81&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR81_.HTM |