HI SCR74 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR74
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Require The Director Of Finance To Conduct A Statewide Program And Budget Performance Review, Pursuant To Section 37-70, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Report To The Legislature In Every Odd-numbered Year.
Title
Urging The Governor To Require The Director Of Finance To Conduct A Statewide Program And Budget Performance Review, Pursuant To Section 37-70, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Report To The Legislature In Every Odd-numbered Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2021-03-29 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 450). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1274) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR74 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 31