HI SCR63 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR63
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Aerospace Development To Facilitate The Formation Of A Multinational Lunar Architecture Alliance To Guide The Development And Implementation Of A Prototype Lunar Base On The Island Of Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Aerospace Development To Facilitate The Formation Of A Multinational Lunar Architecture Alliance To Guide The Development And Implementation Of A Prototype Lunar Base On The Island Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Baker. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-17 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR63 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.