HI SCR63 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Uphold The Citizenship Clause Of The Fourteenth Amendment Of The United States Constitution.
Title
Birthright Citizenship; United States Congress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-11 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Offered. |