HI SCR61 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approving The Fee Simple Sale Of Two Vacant Parcels In Hokulele, Kaneohe, Hawaii.
Title
Approving The Fee Simple Sale Of Two Vacant Parcels In Hokulele, Kaneohe, Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-05-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-10 3:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=61&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SCR61_.HTM |