HI SCR52 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Support Education In The Fine Arts And Hawaiian Studies.
Title
Whole Child Education; Department of Education; Fine Arts; Hawaiian Studies
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 41 |
2016-03-30 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 367). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-30-16. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3191) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, English, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-16-16 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 1:15PM in conference room CR229. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HWN. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=52&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR52_.HTM |