HI SCR52 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, referred to EDU.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, referred to EDU.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of An Academic Symposium To Consider The Establishment Of A Hawaiian Language University Within The University Of Hawaii System.
Title
Hawaiian Language University; University of Hawaii System
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, referred to EDU. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023), with recommendation of referral to EDU. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ryan, Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, English, Kahele. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 04-01-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to HWN, EDU. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=52 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR52_.HTM |