HI SCR51 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Education To Offer Courses In American Sign Language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Sign Language; Department of Education; High Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-03-29SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3186), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2016-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom.
2016-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2016-03-04SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2016-03-03SenateOffered.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback