HI SCR49 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR49
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Private Schools In Hawaii To Consider Offering Or Continue Offering Hawaiian Language Instruction As An Option Or An Elective In Their Academic Curriculum.
Title
Urging Private Schools In Hawaii To Consider Offering Or Continue Offering Hawaiian Language Instruction As An Option Or An Elective In Their Academic Curriculum.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-02-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-23-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-23-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR49 (Carry Over) 2017-03-02 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
HCR37 (Same As) 2017-03-30 - Referred to HWN.
HCR37 (Same As) 2017-03-30 - Referred to HWN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=49&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR49_.HTM |