HI SCR46 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-06 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-06 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April As Sexual Assault Awareness And Prevention Month.
Title
Sexual Assault Awareness and Prevention Month
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 53 | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 387) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) One Day Notice 04-04-11. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-11 3:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Offered. |