HI SCR44 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Evaluate The 2017 University Of Hawaii Internal Audit Of Travel Policy Compliance For Fiscal Years 2015-2017 And Report To The Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Evaluate The 2017 University Of Hawaii Internal Audit Of Travel Policy Compliance For Fiscal Years 2015-2017 And Report To The Legislature.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LHE, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 593) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1815) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from GVO/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1641), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to GVO/HRE, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback