HI SCR42 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR42
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Expand The Kau Rural Health Clinic To Improve Access To Urgent Care And Outpatient Behavioral Health Services.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Expand The Kau Rural Health Clinic To Improve Access To Urgent Care And Outpatient Behavioral Health Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2079-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Har. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 42 |
2022-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3529) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HMS. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR42 (Carry Over) 2021-04-15 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SR37 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR37 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.