HI SCR41 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education And Department Of Human Services To Assist With Increasing Voter Registration Among Young Adults.
Title
Young Adult; Voter Registration; Voter Participation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 703). |
2014-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Oshiro excused (2). |
2014-04-21 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1684-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Say, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Takai, Matsumoto. |
2014-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 56 |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to EDN, HUS, referral sheet 50 |
2014-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 449). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3186) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2954), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HMS, JDL. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=41&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SCR41_.HTM |