HI SCR40 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR40
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Of Hawaii Department Of Defense To Convene An Emergency Management Agency Review Task Force.
Title
Requesting The State Of Hawaii Department Of Defense To Convene An Emergency Management Agency Review Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-24-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 829). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2073-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-12 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, C. Lee, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported from PBS/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1990-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-05 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Cachola, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Choy. |
2018-04-05 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-04-03 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS/VMI on Thursday, 04-05-18 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to PBS/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2018-03-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 456) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-28-18. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3214) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR40 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to CPH, WAM.