HI SCR40 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Petitioning Congress For A Limited Amendments Convention For The Purpose Of Proposing A Free And Fair Elections Amendment To The United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petition for Convention for Purpose of Proposing Amendments to the United States Constitution; Elections; Campaign Financing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
2016-03-17SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2877), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
2016-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
2016-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-16 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2016-03-03SenateReferred to PSM, JDL.
2016-02-24SenateOffered.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback