HI SCR4 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct An Analysis Of The Regulation And Licensure Of Associate Physicians.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct An Analysis Of The Regulation And Licensure Of Associate Physicians.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported from CPC/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2161) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-04-13 | House | The committee on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Morikawa, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-04-13 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen. |
2023-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC/LMG on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to CPC/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2023-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 559) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1430), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Offered. |