HI SCR4 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR4
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring Homelessness To Be A Medical Condition In The State For Purposes Of Medicaid Eligibility And Recognizing That Housing Instability Is A Major Health Factor That Negatively Affects Homeless Individuals' Health And Well-being.
Title
Declaring Homelessness To Be A Medical Condition In The State For Purposes Of Medicaid Eligibility And Recognizing That Housing Instability Is A Major Health Factor That Negatively Affects Homeless Individuals' Health And Well-being.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1206), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR4 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=4&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR4_.HTM |