HI SCR38 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Convene A Task Force To Document And Collect Data Identifying Economic, Environmental, And Regulatory Consequences Of Crop Degradation Caused By Invasive And Endangered Species In Hawaii.
Title
Invasive and Endangered Species Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee on WLA deferred the measure. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to WLA/EET, WAM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=38&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR38_.HTM |