HI SCR34 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN/LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN/LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct Audits Of State Department Operations That Result In High Non-base Compensation Of State Employees, Pay For Not Working, And Salary Overpayments.
Title
Audit; Overtime; Pension Spiking; Overpayment (SCR34 HD1)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN/LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1790-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN/LMG. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Souki, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Takumi. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Monday, 04-16-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN/LMG, referral sheet 62 | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 460) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) One Day Notice 04-04-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Reported from SCA01 (Spec. Com. Rep. No. 1) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on SCA01 recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in SCA01 were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Espero, Hee, Ihara, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on SCA01 added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-20-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee on SCA01 deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on SCA01 has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) The committee on SCA01 deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on SCA01 has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Referred to SCA01 (Senate Special Committee on Accountability - 01). | |
2012-02-08 | (S) Offered. |