HI SCR234 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Agriculture To Expand Its Quarantine Facilities Of The Plant Quarantine Branch.
Title
Urging The Department Of Agriculture To Expand Its Quarantine Facilities Of The Plant Quarantine Branch.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1762), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 04-07-21 10:30AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 584) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-24-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR234 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR194 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR194 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Coffee Leaf Rust
Hawaii Department of Agriculture
Plant Pest and Disease Management and Disaster Prevention Program
Plant Quarantine Branch
United States Department of Agriculture
Hawaii Department of Agriculture
Plant Pest and Disease Management and Disaster Prevention Program
Plant Quarantine Branch
United States Department of Agriculture