HI SCR232 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development To Convene A Multi-agency Working Group To Make Recommendations For Planning, Coordinating, And Implementing The Objectives And Policies For Housing In The Hawaii State Planning Act.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Planning And Sustainable Development To Convene A Multi-agency Working Group To Make Recommendations For Planning, Coordinating, And Implementing The Objectives And Policies For Housing In The Hawaii State Planning Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2114-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2022-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-14-22 10:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 711) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3715) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Misalucha. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR232 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to WTL.
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Working Group
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Working Group